VA HB1127 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0566)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0566)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Forest fire protection compacts; codification. Codifies the text of the Southeastern Interstate Forest Fire Protection Compact (the SIFFPC) and the Middle Atlantic Interstate Forest Fire Protection Compact, originally incorporated into the Code of Virginia by reference in 1956 and 1966, respectively. In the section that codifies the SIFFPC, the names of state entities in the Commonwealth are updated. The bill also repeals an obsolete section of the 1956 act that originally provided for the appointment of members to a compact advisory committee; the committee no longer exists. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Code Commission.
Title
Forest fire protection compacts; codification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0566) | |
2016-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 566 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-08 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-08 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1127ER) |
2016-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-27 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100165D |