VA HB1127 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Career and technical education; three-year licenses; eligibility and requirements. Makes changes to three-year career and technical education teacher licenses by (i) removing the cap on licensee teaching hours and permitting licensees to teach up to full time, (ii) expanding eligibility for such licenses to any individual who has at least two years of experience as a teaching assistant in the school division in the specific career and technical education subject area in which the individual seeks to teach and meets all other applicable eligibility criteria, and (iii) increasing from one year to two years the period during which the employing school board is required to assign a mentor to supervise a licensee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Career and technical education; changes to three-year licenses, eligibility and requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in Education
2018-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2018-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100763D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221299.6(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback