VA HB1127 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - VOTE: Engrossment (44-Y 49-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Board of Medical Assistance Services; definition of therapeutic day treatment. Directs the Board of Medical Assistance Services to revise its regulations to define "therapeutic day treatment" as a preventive mental health support available in place of partial hospitalization and reformative care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Therapeutic day treatment; definition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Engrossment (44-Y 49-N) (Y: 43 N: 49 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Engrossment (44-Y 49-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossment refused by House (44-Y 49-N)
2020-02-10HouseSubstitute by Delegate Davis agreed to 20108103D-H2
2020-02-10HouseHealth, Welfare and Institutions substitute ruled out of order 20107481D-H1
2020-02-10HouseFloor substitute printed 20108103D-H2 (Davis)
2020-02-10HousePassed by temporarily
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-07HousePassed by for the day
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseReported from Appropriations (18-Y 3-N)
2020-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-04HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
2020-02-04HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2020-02-04HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107481D-H1
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
2020-01-24HouseAssigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104228D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1127&201+sum+HB1127
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1127+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1127H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1127H2+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1203V0016+HB1127
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H12V0107+HB1127
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H12V0254+HB1127
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0205V0032+HB1127
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0205V0068+HB1127
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0126+HB1127
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0179+HB1127
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0657+HB1127

Bill Comments

feedback