VA HB1135 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0859)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0859)
Summary
Expression of religious viewpoints in the public schools. Provides that a student's voluntary expression of a religious viewpoint on an otherwise permissible subject must be not be discriminated against by local school divisions.
Title
Public schools; student's voluntary expression of a religious viewpoint.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0859) | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 859 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1135ER2) | |
2008-04-23 | House: Reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-22 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-04-11 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1135ER) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 083380504-S1 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1135S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 083380504-S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 083380504-S1 | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Public Education | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-08 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-08 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE #2 (85-Y 13-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Passed House (85-Y 13-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House | |
2008-02-08 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (88-Y 10-N) | |
2008-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1135H1 | |
2008-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 083369504-H1 | |
2008-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-06 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-05 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 083369504-H1 | |
2008-02-04 | House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083335504 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1135 |