VA HB1172 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Electronic health records; digital format. Requires electronic health record systems to transfer data in a common file format that is suitable for electronic access and use by the receiving entity and provides that if an individual requests his health record in an electronic format from a health care entity, the health care entity shall provide such health record in a common electronic file format that is suitable for electronic access and use by the receiving entity.
Title
Electronic health records; digital format.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104952D |