VA HB1181 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0845)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0845)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; reading intervention. Requires local school divisions to provide reading intervention services to students in grade three who demonstrate deficiencies based on their individual performance on the Standards of Learning reading test or any reading diagnostic test that meets criteria established by the Department of Education. The local school division, at its discretion, shall provide such intervention before promotion to grade four.
Title
Public schools; reading intervention.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Steven Landes [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (7-Y 88-N) (Y: 8 N: 89 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0845) | |
2012-05-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 845 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Communicated to Governor | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: REJECTED (7-Y 88-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House rejected Governor's recommendation (7-Y 88-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-02 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-02 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1181ER) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Printed as engrossed 12104027D-E | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1181E | |
2012-02-13 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | House: Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education | |
2012-01-25 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-01-25 | House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-18 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12104027D |