VA HB1214 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Failed to report (defeated) in Health, Welfare and Institutions (9-Y 11-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Failed to report (defeated) in Health, Welfare and Institutions (9-Y 11-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Family day homes; licensure threshold. Reduces from five to three the number of children for whom a family day home must obtain a license to provide child care services.
Title
Family day homes; licensure threshold.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Health, Welfare and Institutions (9-Y 11-N) (Y: 9 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (3-Y 1-N) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (3-Y 1-N) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Health, Welfare and Institutions (9-Y 11-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (3-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Social Services |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred from Education by voice vote |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102193D |