VA HB1222 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0902)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0902)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Notaries; satisfactory evidence of identity; persons in nursing homes or assisted living facilities. Allows expired state issued driver's licenses or state issued identification cards and expired passports to be used as a means of identification for notarial purposes for individuals residing in nursing homes or assisted living facilities, provided such expired documents expired within five years of the date of use for such identification purposes.
Title
Notaries; satisfactory evidence of identity, persons in nursing homes or assisted living facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0902) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 902 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2020 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1222ER) |
2020-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-31 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104149D |