VA HB1269 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1128)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1128)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Veterans Services Foundation. Provides that the board of trustees of the Veterans Services Foundation may be assisted in the administration of the Foundation by volunteers and staff members employed by the Executive Director. The bill also (i) adds agents and advisors to the composition of the Foundation membership; (ii) allows ex officio members who do not serve as the chairman of another board to serve as chairman of the board of trustees; (iii) specifies that individuals appointed to perform the duties of treasurer and secretary are ex officio, nonvoting officers of the board of trustees; (iv) provides that employment of agents, advisors, volunteers, or employees by the Executive Director is subject to the approval of the board of trustees; and (v) clarifies that the members of the board of trustees and employees of the Foundation are subject to the State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act (§ 2.2-3100 et seq.).
Title
Veterans Services Foundation; board of trustees assisted by volunteers, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Michael Mullin [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1128) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1128 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1269ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Agree To (95-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senators: Mason, Bell, Reeves |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | Delegates: Helmer, VanValkenburg, Fowler |
2020-03-02 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-02 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 97-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (12-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Printed as engrossed 20104882D-E |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1269E |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Adminstrative Process |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104882D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2715 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2715.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2716 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |