VA HB1270 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative; prohibition on participation by Commonwealth. Prohibits the Governor or any state agency from adopting any regulation establishing a carbon dioxide cap-and-trade program or bringing about the participation by the Commonwealth in a regional market for the trading of carbon dioxide allowances. The bill provides that the Commonwealth shall be allowed to participate in such a cap-and-trade program if the House of Delegates and the Senate of Virginia each adopt a resolution that specifically references and approves the regulatory text proposed for adoption by a state agency.
Title
Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative; prohibition on participation by Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Del. Charles Poindexter [R] | Del. Gordon Helsel [R] | Del. Terry Kilgore [R] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
Sen. John McGuire [R] | Del. Israel O'Quinn [R] | Del. Robert Thomas [R] | Del. Thomas Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 47-N) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 47-N) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2018-04-09 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2018-03-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1270ER) |
2018-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 4-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 47-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (51-Y 47-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-05 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-02 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-30 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 10-N) |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103053D |