VA HB1272 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0564)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0564)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hunting license; senior resident lifetime license for hunting bear, deer, and turkey. Directs the Board of Game and Inland Fisheries to provide a basic senior resident lifetime hunting license that includes both a basic hunting license and a special bear, deer, and turkey license. The license shall be available only to a resident of the Commonwealth who is 80 years of age or older and shall cost $200.
Title
Hunting license; senior resident lifetime license for hunting bear, deer, and turkey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0564) | |
2020-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 564 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1272ER) |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-28 | House | VOTE: Passage (96-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Printed as engrossed 20101530D-E |
2020-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1272E |
2020-01-27 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (20-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101530D |