VA HB130 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle safety inspection program. Abolishes the state motor vehicle safety inspection program.
Title
Motor vehicle safety inspection program; abolishes the state program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Transportation |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2019-12-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-12-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101215D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 69.48:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 275.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1001.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1005.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1005.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1025 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1043 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1048 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1053 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1060.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1065 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1072.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1092 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1176 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1190.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1531 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1539 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1539.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2000.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2099.50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 602.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 602.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 602.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 694.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 730 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 730.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1716 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |