VA HB1315 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Jury commissioners; lists of unqualified persons provided to general registrars. Requires the jury commissioner to retain information obtained from those persons not qualified to serve as jurors as a result of (i) not being a citizen of the United States, (ii) no longer being a resident of the Commonwealth, (iii) being a resident of another county or city in the Commonwealth, (iv) having been convicted of a felony and not having had voting rights restored, or (v) having been adjudicated incapacitated. The bill requires the sheriff, clerk of court, or other official responsible for maintaining such information provided by the commissioners to make that information available upon the request of the general registrar for that locality. The bill also requires the general registrars to use the information received to identify voters who are no longer qualified to vote and to initiate list maintenance procedures pursuant to current law. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2016.
Title
Jury commissioners; retention of information obtained from those not qualified to serve.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (32-Y 67-N) (Y: 32 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 12-N) (Y: 89 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 26-N) (Y: 76 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 12-N) (Y: 89 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 26-N) (Y: 76 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2015-04-15 | House | Communicated to Governor |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (32-Y 67-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation (32-Y 67-N) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1315ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 12-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (87-Y 12-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (12-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 26-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (74-Y 26-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1315H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104876D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104876D-H1 |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (19-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2014-11-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-11-16 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100786D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 427 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 345 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |