VA HB1321 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1321
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Guardianship; supported decision making. Creates the Supported Decision-Making Act, which allows an adult with an intellectual or developmental disability to enter into an agreement with another person, called a "supporter," for the purposes of having the supporter assist the adult in making decisions to manage his affairs, giving adults who need assistance a less restrictive means of receiving such assistance than being appointed a guardian or conservator by a court. The bill further requires a guardian ad litem in a proceeding for the appointment of a guardian or conservator to consider whether a less restrictive alternative, including the use of an advance directive or durable power of attorney, is available to provide assistance to the respondent, and it requires the guardian ad litem to include in his report to the court information as to whether a supported decision-making agreement is a viable option in lieu of guardianship or conservatorship. The bill also provides that if the respondent to a guardianship or conservatorship petition is between 17 and a half and 21 years of age and has an Individualized Education Plan (IEP), the guardian ad litem appointed to represent the respondent shall review the IEP and include the results of his review in the report required to be submitted to the court, and it requires the Superintendent of Public Instruction to prepare transitional materials, including information about supported decision-making agreements and guardianship to be provided to students and parents during the student's annual IEP meeting. The bill requires the court, upon appointment of a guardian or conservator, to inform such person of his duties and that the respondent should be encouraged to participate in decisions, act on his own behalf, and develop or maintain the capacity to manage his personal affairs if he retains any decision-making rights. Finally, the bill sets out specific language to be included in all orders of appointment of a guardian. This bill is a recommendation of the Joint Commission on Health Care.
Title
Guardianship; supported decision making.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred from Education by voice vote |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103127D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1321 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 23 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 1200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 1207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 2000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 2003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 2007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1321 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1321+hil |