VA HB1325 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Continued to 2019 in Privileges and Elections (13-Y 1-N)
Pending: Senate Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Continued to 2019 in Privileges and Elections (13-Y 1-N)
Pending: Senate Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provisional voting; persons voting in split precincts. Provides that any voter who is assigned to a precinct that is split between two or more election districts and who believes he was given a ballot for the district of which he is not a qualified voter may request, prior to casting the ballot, and shall be permitted to cast a provisional ballot for the district of which he believes he is a qualified voter and for the district in which the pollbook indicates he is registered. The bill requires the ballots to be sealed in envelopes labeled with the corresponding district number and then sealed in the green envelope provided for all provisional ballots. At the meeting to determine the validity of all provisional ballots offered in the election, the electoral board shall verify which district the voter is a qualified voter of and count that ballot.
Title
Provisional voting; persons voting in split precincts.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Privileges and Elections (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (91-Y 6-N) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (91-Y 6-N) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Privileges and Elections (13-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-01 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (91-Y 6-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Passed House (91-Y 6-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2018-02-01 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-26 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104717D |