VA HB1325 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1055)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1055)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Obsolete Acts of Assembly; racial inequity. Repeals numerous obsolete and discriminatory Acts of Assembly from the early 20th century. This is a recommendation of the Governor's Commission to Examine Racial Inequity in Virginia Law. The purpose of the Commission was to identify and make "recommendations to address laws that were intended to or could have the effect of promoting or enabling racial discrimination or inequity."
Title
Racial inequity; repeals numerous obsolete and discriminatory Acts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1055) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1055 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1325ER) |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102523D |
Same As/Similar To
SB636 (Same As) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1056)