VA HB1332 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Passed by for the day
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Passed by for the day
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
House of Delegates districts; technical adjustments. Changes district assignments of certain census blocks between Districts 5 and 6 in Smyth County and between Districts 42 and 43 in Fairfax County in order to reflect new precinct lines. All four districts will continue to have deviations of less than one percent from the ideal district population.
Title
House of Delegates districts; technical adjustment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (69-Y 30-N) (Y: 71 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 17-N) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N) (Y: 97 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 17-N) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N) (Y: 97 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (69-Y 30-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | Governor's veto overridden (69-Y 30-N) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1332ER) |
2015-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (20-Y 17-N) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 5-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB1332H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Substitute by Delegate Sickles agreed to 15104914D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-09 | House | Floor substitute printed 15104914D-H1 (Sickles) |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-11-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-11-24 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100642D |