VA HB1355 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0872)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0872)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Community Services Efficiency Act; Department of Education; community schools. Requires the Department of Education to establish an interagency task force composed of state and local agencies and entities in the areas of early childhood development, health, social services, community engagement, family engagement, higher education, communities in schools, and workforce development for the purpose of developing a program for the establishment of community schools whereby public elementary and secondary schools serve as centers for the provision of such community programs and services to students and their families as may be necessary on the basis of the unique needs of the student population to be served. The bill requires such program to include a process by which school boards and community partnerships may apply to the Department of Education to designate an elementary or secondary school in the local school division as a community school.
Title
Community schools; establishment, community programs, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (61-Y 36-N) (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 36-N) (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 4-N) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 36-N) (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 4-N) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0872) | |
2020-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 872 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1355ER) |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: Adoption (61-Y 36-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (61-Y 36-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (29-Y 11-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (64-Y 36-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (64-Y 36-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 20105737D-EH1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1355EH1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee on Appropriations amendment agreed to |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee on Education substitute agreed to 20105737D-H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 20105737D-H1 |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101221D |