VA HB1363 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Licensure exemption for student practice of veterinary medicine and veterinary technology; temporary postgraduate license; regulations. Provides for (i) the issuance of a temporary postgraduate license to practice veterinary medicine to individuals participating in a veterinary residency or internship in a veterinary medical education program and (ii) an exemption from licensure for the practice of veterinary medicine and veterinary technology for qualified students completing a veterinary medicine or veterinary technology externship or preceptorship.
Title
Veterinary medicine and veterinary technology; licensure exemption for student practice, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Larry Rush [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104226D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 3801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3805.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |