VA HB1371 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1159)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

TANF; diversionary cash assistance. Imposes a minimum threshold of $1,500 on Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) diversionary cash assistance. The bill provides that any person who receives TANF diversionary cash assistance waives his eligibility for TANF for the number of days for which assistance is granted multiplied by 1.33. The bill also requires the Board of Social Services to adopt regulations to enable TANF-eligible applicants meeting certain criteria to receive a TANF emergency assistance payment of up to $1,500 to prevent eviction or to address needs resulting from a fire or natural disaster.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TANF; diversionary cash assistance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-11 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1159)
2020-04-11 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1159 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-03SenateSigned by President
2020-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-02HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1371ER)
2020-03-02HouseEnrolled
2020-02-25SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenateRead third time
2020-02-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07HousePrinted as engrossed 20102506D-E
2020-02-07HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1371E
2020-02-07HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-07HouseRead second time
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseReported from Appropriations with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-22HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2020-01-21HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-21HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned HWI sub: Social Services
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102506D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
632617(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1371&201+sum+HB1371
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1371+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1371E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1371ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1159+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1204V0003+HB1371
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H12V0018+HB1371
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0205V0028+HB1371
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0205V0064+HB1371
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0130+HB1371
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0183+HB1371
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0768+HB1371
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S09V0144+HB1371
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0930HB1371+HB1371
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0963HB1371+HB1371

Bill Comments

feedback