VA HB1377 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Possession and administration of epinephrine; outdoor educational programs. Provides that an employee of an organization that provides outdoor educational experiences or programs for youth who is authorized by a prescriber and trained in the administration of epinephrine may possess and administer epinephrine and provides liability protection for such employees.
Title
Epinephrine; possession and administration at outdoor educational programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247) | |
2018-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 247 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1377ER) |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107130D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1377S1 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107130D-S1 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107130D-S1 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-12 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104300D |