VA HB1389 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0871)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0871)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
College Partnership Laboratory Schools. Allows for the establishment of college partnership laboratory schools by any public institution of higher education that operates an approved teacher education program. Such schools shall be public schools established by a contract between the governing board of the school and the Board of Education. Teachers working in such schools shall be employees of the institution of higher education and shall either be licensed by the Board or eligible for such license.
Title
College Partnership Laboratory Schools; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (81-Y 14-N) (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (77-Y 20-N) (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO SUSPEND (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (81-Y 14-N) (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (77-Y 20-N) (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO SUSPEND (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0871) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 871 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1389ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (24-Y 15-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (81-Y 14-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (81-Y 14-N) | |
2010-04-20 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1389ER) | |
2010-03-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 6-N) | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (77-Y 20-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Read third time and passed House (77-Y 20-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO SUSPEND (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Rules suspended (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1389H1 | |
2010-03-08 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105788D-H1 | |
2010-03-08 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-05 | House: Read first time | |
2010-03-03 | House: Reported from Appropriations (17-Y 5-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-03-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105788D-H1 | |
2010-03-03 | House: Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 4-N) | |
2010-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2010-02-11 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10105324D | |
2010-02-11 | House: Introduced at the request of Governor |
Same As/Similar To
SB736 (Same As) 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0816)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 253.14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.24 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |