VA HB1410 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0843)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0843)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Food stamps; Restaurant Meals Program. Directs the Department of Social Services to participate in the Restaurant Meals Program (RMP) of the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP). The bill requires the Department to develop and implement a plan to begin such participation no later than January 1, 2021.
Title
Food stamps; Restaurant Meals Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 41-N 1-A) (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 41-N 1-A) (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0843) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 843 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1410ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 41-N 1-A) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (54-Y 41-N 1-A) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (15-Y 7-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Social Services |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104292D |