VA HB1423 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Orders of restitution; enforcement. Provides that an order of restitution shall be docketed in the name of the Commonwealth on behalf of a victim, unless the victim named in the order of restitution requests in writing that the order be docketed in the name of the victim. The bill provides that an order of restitution docketed in the name of the victim shall be enforced by the victim as a civil judgment. The bill also states that the clerk of such court shall record and disburse restitution payments in accordance with orders of restitution or judgments for restitution docketed in the name of the Commonwealth. The bill provides that at any time before a judgment for restitution docketed in the name of the Commonwealth is satisfied, the court shall, at the written request of the victim, order the circuit court clerk to execute and docket an assignment of the judgment to the victim and remove from its automated financial system the amount of unpaid restitution.
Title
Orders of restitution; enforcement.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2020-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105011D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 305.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 305.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |