VA HB1432 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1432
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Certain early childhood care and education programs; parents of enrolled children; car seats for field trips. Requires the Department of Social Services to adopt regulations to require the parent of any child who attends any certified preschool, child day center, child day home, or family day home, including any registered family day home, to provide an age-appropriate and developmentally appropriate car seat for his child on any day on which the child attends a field trip that requires the use of such a car seat. The bill requires the Board of Education to adopt the same regulations for any Virginia Preschool Initiative program or early childhood special education program licensed by the Board of Education and directs any Head Start program offered in the Commonwealth to adopt the same requirement.
Title
Early childhood care and education programs, certain; parents of enrolled children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-10 | House | Pursuant to House Rule 22 |
2020-02-10 | House | Rereferred to Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-10 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (16-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Social Services |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred from Education by voice vote |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103243D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1432 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions