VA HB1444 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0723)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0723)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vision care plans; reimbursement for services. Prohibits a participating provider agreement between a vision care plan carrier and an optometrist or ophthalmologist that is entered into, amended, extended or renewed on or after January 1, 2016, from establishing the fee or rate that the optometrist or ophthalmologist is required to accept for the provision of health care materials or services, or from requiring that an optometrist or ophthalmologist accept the reimbursement paid by the vision care plan carrier as payment in full, unless the services or materials are covered services or covered materials under the applicable vision care plan. Reimbursements by a vision care plan carrier are required to be reasonable, which is defined as the negotiated fee or rate that is set forth in the participating provider agreement and is acceptable to the provider. Vision care plans shall not require an optometrist or ophthalmologist to use a particular optical laboratory, manufacturer of eyeglass frames or contact lenses, or third-party supplier as a condition of participation in a vision care plan. Changes to a participating provider agreement shall be submitted in writing to the optometrist or ophthalmologist at least 30 days prior to their effective date. Provisions of this measure that relate to covered materials also apply to licensed opticians practicing in the Commonwealth. The State Corporation Commission does not have jurisdiction to adjudicate individual controversies arising out of this measure. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2016.
Title
Vision care plans; reimbursement for services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0723) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 723 (effective 1/1/16) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1444ER2) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2015-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/27/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1444ER) |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1444H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104222D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104222D-H1 |
2015-02-05 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 2-N) |
2015-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2014-12-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-12-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100579D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3407.19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |