VA HB1462 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0999)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0999)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Admission to bail; rebuttable presumptions against bail. Eliminates the provision prohibiting a judicial officer who is a magistrate, clerk, or deputy clerk of a district court or circuit court from admitting to bail, that is not set by a judge, any person who is charged with an offense giving rise to a rebuttable presumption against bail without the concurrence of an attorney for the Commonwealth. The bill also eliminates the requirement that notice be provided to the attorney for the Commonwealth before such judicial officer may set or admit a person to bail.
Title
Admission to bail; rebuttable presumptions against bail.
Sponsors
Del. Don Scott [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 44-N) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (8-Y 4-N) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (8-Y 4-N) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0999) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 999 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1462ER) |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (53-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 18-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with amendment (8-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 20107424D-EH1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1462EH1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Amendment by Delegate Scott agreed to |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107424D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107424D-H1 |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-26 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103171D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 120.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 124 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |