VA HB1482 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Use of unmanned aircraft system; public bodies. Allows an unmanned aircraft system to be deployed without a warrant (i) by a law-enforcement officer to survey the scene of an accident for the purpose of crash reconstruction and record photographic or video images of the scene and (ii) by the Department of Transportation when assisting a law-enforcement officer to prepare a report of such accident because of personal injury, death, or property damage of $1,500 or more. This bill is identical to SB 508.
Title
Unmanned aircraft systems; use by public bodies, search warrant required, exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 546 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1482ER) |
2018-03-10 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-08 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Conference substitute printed 18107803D-H2 |
2018-03-06 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senators: Reeves, Peake, Deeds |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2018-02-27 | House | Delegates: Thomas, Bell, Robert B., Mullin |
2018-02-27 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2018-02-26 | House | House acceded to request |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 18107240D-S1 (0-Y 99-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1482S1 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107240D-S1 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107240D-S1 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-09 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1482H1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18105987D-H1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 18105987D-H1 |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18105420D |