VA HB1511 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0238)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0238)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Service of process; investigator employed by an attorney for the Commonwealth or Indigent Defense Commission. Provides that certain investigators employed by an attorney for the Commonwealth or by the Indigent Defense Commission while engaged in the performance of their official duties shall not be considered a party or otherwise interested in the subject matter in controversy and, thus, are authorized to serve process, provided that the sheriff in the jurisdiction where process is to be served has agreed that such investigators may serve process.
Title
Service of process; investigator employed by an attorney for the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0238) | |
2018-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 238 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1511ER) |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107241D-S1 (95-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (25-Y 15-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1511S1 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107241D-S1 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107241D-S1 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18105171D |