VA HB1519 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1043)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1043)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commission to Study Slavery and Subsequent De Jure and De Facto Racial and Economic Discrimination Against African Americans; report; sunset. Creates the Commission to Study Slavery and Subsequent De Jure and De Facto Racial and Economic Discrimination Against African Americans to (i) study the current impact and long-term inequities of slavery and the subsequent state-sanctioned de jure and de facto racial and economic discrimination practiced against African Americans and (ii) make recommendations to the General Assembly on appropriate remedies. The bill requires the Commission to annually submit a report on its interim activity and work to the Governor and the General Assembly. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2022.
Title
Commission to Study Slavery and Subsequent De Jure and De Facto Racial and Economic Discrimination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1043) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1043 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1519ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senators: Locke, McClellan, Vogel |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Delegates: McQuinn, Bagby, Fowler |
2020-03-03 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-03 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 100-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Adminstrative Process |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-08 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105093D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2544 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2550 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |