VA HB1522 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1000)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1000)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Forfeiture of property used in connection with the commission of crimes; finding of guilt required. Requires that any action for the forfeiture of property used in connection with the commission of a crime be stayed until the person whose property is the subject of the forfeiture action has been found guilty of the crime authorizing the forfeiture, regardless of whether he has been sentenced. The bill provides that property may be forfeited even though no finding of guilt is made if (i) the forfeiture is ordered by the court pursuant to a plea agreement or (ii) the owner has not submitted a written demand for the return of the property within 21 days from the date the stay terminates.
Title
Forfeiture of property used in connection with the commission of crimes; finding of guilt required.
Sponsors
Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Nicholas Freitas [R] | Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 1-N) (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 1-N) (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1000) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1000 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1522ER) |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1522H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106992D-H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Incorporates HB225 (Freitas) |
2020-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106992D-H1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104679D |
Same As/Similar To
HB225 (Similar To) 2020-01-31 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 386.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.29 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.31 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.32 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.34 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |