VA HB1523 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0455)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0455)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Historical African American Cemeteries and Graves Fund. Creates the Historical African American Cemeteries and Graves Fund and provides that any funds that are appropriated to the Department of Historic Resources but not used for the maintenance of graves, in particular the listed historical African American cemeteries, shall be deposited in the Fund. The bill authorizes the Director of the Department to manage and administer the Fund and to disburse moneys in the Fund to maintain additional graves that have been certified by the Department and documented in the Department's cultural resources database.
Title
Historical African American Cemeteries and Graves Fund; created.
Sponsors
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0455) | |
2020-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 455 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1523ER) |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108494D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1523S1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108494D-S1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108494D-S1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1523H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107734D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Incorporates HB1234 (Wilt) |
2020-02-05 | House | Incorporates HB379 (Sullivan) |
2020-02-05 | House | Incorporates HB905 (Hayes) |
2020-02-05 | House | Incorporates HB1593 (Fariss) |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107734D-H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20102879D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 2202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 2211.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 2211.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |