VA HB1528 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0077)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0077)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act; disclosure by executive directors and members of industrial development authorities and economic development authorities; penalty. Requires the executive director and members of each industrial development authority and economic development authority, as created under the authority of the Industrial Development and Revenue Bond Act, to file a Statement of Economic Interests (SOEI) with the clerk of the local governing body as a condition to assuming office and thereafter annually on or before February 1. The first disclosure form for the executive director and members of each industrial development authority and economic development authority is due on August 1, 2020. Current law requires members of industrial development authorities and economic development authorities to file a Financial Disclosure Statement unless the governing body that appoints the members has required the members to file an SOEI. The bill makes the filing of an SOEI mandatory. Current law provides that any person who knowingly and intentionally makes a false statement of material fact on the SOEI is guilty of a Class 5 felony.
Title
Conflict of Interests Act, State and Local Government; disclosure by executive directors & members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0077) | |
2020-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 77 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 3, 2020 | |
2020-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1528ER) |
2020-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-29 | House | VOTE: (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-23 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105237D |
Same As/Similar To
SB703 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0081)