VA HB1533 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Motion picture production tax credit; aggregate cap. Increases beginning in fiscal year 2020 the aggregate limit on the amount of motion picture production tax credits that may be issued from $6.5 million to $13 million annually. The bill provides that the increase to the cap shall be reserved for productions filmed in economically distressed areas of Virginia.
Title
Motion picture production; increases aggregate cap on amount of tax credits.
Sponsors
Del. Terry Kilgore [R] | Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Del. Carrie Coyner [R] | Del. James Morefield [R] |
Del. Israel O'Quinn [R] | Del. William Wampler [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104743D |