VA HB154 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0208)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0208)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinsurance credits. Conforms Virginia's law regarding credits to insurers for reinsurance ceded to approved assuming insurers to the provisions of the Credit for Reinsurance Model Law of the National Association of Insurance Commissioners. The bill eliminates the reinsurance collateral requirements for assuming insurers that are domiciled in or have their head office in a reciprocal jurisdiction, which is defined in the bill. Under the bill, such assuming insurers are required to maintain a minimum capital and surplus, maintain a minimal solvency or capital ratio, as applicable, and provide notice to the State Corporation Commission in the event of noncompliance of any requirements. The bill requires the Commission to create and publish a list of reciprocal jurisdictions and assuming insurers.
Title
Reinsurance credits; conforms Virginia's law regarding credits to insurers for reinsurance, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0208) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 208 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020 | |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB154ER) |
2020-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-22 | House | VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB154H1 |
2020-01-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20104676D-H1 |
2020-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 20104676D-H1 |
2020-01-16 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-12-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2019-12-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102589D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 1316.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1316.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1316.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1316.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |