VA HB1541 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1235)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1235)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creation of the Central Virginia Transportation Authority; funding. Creates the Central Virginia Transportation Authority, comprising the counties and cities located in Planning District 15. The Authority will administer transportation funding generated through the imposition of an additional regional 0.7 percent sales and use tax and a wholesale gas tax of 7.6 cents per gallon of gasoline and 7.7 cents per gallon of diesel fuel. The gas tax rates would be indexed for inflation. The bill requires a local maintenance of effort for transit funding of at least 50 percent of what was provided on July 1, 2020, with such amount to be indexed beginning in 2023. The Authority is directed to review the governance structure of existing transit service in the Richmond region, and evaluate the possibility of creating a transportation district, and report its findings by December 1, 2020 to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Title
Central Virginia Transportation Authority; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (62-Y 31-N) (Y: 62 N: 31 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (65-Y 28-N) (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (66-Y 32-N) (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 2-N) (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 4-N) (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (65-Y 28-N) (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (66-Y 32-N) (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 2-N) (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 4-N) (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1235) | |
2020-04-22 | House | Enacted, Chapter 1235 (effective - see bill) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1541ER2) |
2020-04-22 | House | Reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (24-Y 16-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | VOTE: (62-Y 31-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (62-Y 31-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1541ER) |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108772D-S1 (65-Y 28-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (25-Y 14-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1541S1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108772D-S1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Adoption (65-Y 28-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108772D-S1 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (66-Y 32-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (66-Y 32-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1541H2 |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 20107480D-H2 |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee on Finance substitute rejected 20107025D-H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107480D-H2 |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107025D-H1 |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 4-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104391D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 2 | 3700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 3713 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2295.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2299.20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 603.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 604.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 638 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |