VA HB1575 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0541)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0541)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Merchants' capital tax; separate classification; retailers. Provides that the merchants' capital of any retailer reported as inventory that is located in a structure that contains at least 200,000 square feet, with at least 200,000 square feet used solely to store such inventory, shall, along with certain wholesalers, be considered a separate classification and may be taxed at a lower rate than other classifications of merchants' capital. Under current law, only merchants' capital of wholesalers meeting a similar threshold of 100,000 square feet constitutes a separate class of property.
Title
Merchants' capital tax; separate classification, retailers.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Joshua Cole [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (79-Y 19-N) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (79-Y 19-N) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0541) | |
2020-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 541 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1575ER) |
2020-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (79-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (79-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1575H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106932D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106932D-H1 |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105515D |