VA HB1589 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Lottery Board; repeal prohibition against sale of lottery tickets over the Internet; regulation of the manufacturing, distributing, hosting, and playing of electronic gaming devices; penalties. Renames the Virginia Lottery as the Virginia Lottery and Gaming Department and the Virginia Lottery Board as the Virginia Lottery and Gaming Oversight Board. The bill authorizes the manufacture, distribution, hosting, and playing of electronic gaming devices in the Commonwealth, to be regulated by the Virginia Lottery and Gaming Oversight Board. The bill specifies the licensing requirements for the manufacture, distribution, and hosting of electronic gaming devices and imposes criminal and civil penalties for violations of the law and regulations related to electronic gaming devices. The bill prohibits any host location licensee from offering more than five electronic gaming devices to the public for play at such host location's establishment and allows for a maximum of 15,000 electronic gaming devices in the Commonwealth. The bill imposes a 35 percent tax on all gross profits from the play of electronic gaming devices and provides for disbursement of the tax proceeds. The bill also establishes the Problem Gambling Treatment and Support Fund, administered by the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, to provide counseling and other support services for compulsive and problem gamblers, develop problem gambling treatment and prevention programs, and provide grants to support organizations that provide assistance to compulsive and problem gamblers. The bill authorizes the Lottery to sell tickets over the Internet. Under current law, it is prohibited from doing so.
Title
Virginia Lottery Board; regulation of electronic gaming devices, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in General Laws |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105636D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.016 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 334.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.22 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 389 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 419 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 314.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 322.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4007.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4008 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4011 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4012 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4020.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4025 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4027 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4030 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4056 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 460 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 148.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 195.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |