VA HB1592 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
High school graduation requirements; verified units of credit; alternative assessments. Requires the Board of Education to establish guidelines for the award of verified units of credit to students who take and achieve satisfactory scores on certain alternative assessments in lieu of the corresponding Standards of Learning assessment.
Title
High school graduation requirements; verified units of credit, alternative assessments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Education |
2015-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Reform |
2015-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101070D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1592 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1592+hil |