VA HB1592 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-31 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-31 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deferred dispositions; larceny. Provides that a court, upon a plea of guilty or not guilty to a first offense misdemeanor larceny charge, if the facts found by the court would justify a finding of guilt, without entering a judgment of guilt and with the consent of the accused, may defer further proceedings and place the accused on probation subject to terms and conditions set by the court, provided that such person has not previously been convicted of any felony.
Title
Deferred dispositions; larceny, probation.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Joshua Cole [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | House | Incorporated by Courts of Justice |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB660-Mullin) by voice vote |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104863D |
Same As/Similar To
HB660 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0989)
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1592 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1592+hil |