VA HB1602 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1119)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1119)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Tourism Authority; Governor's New Airline Service Incentive Fund. Creates the Governor's New Airline Service Incentive Fund to be administered by the Virginia Tourism Authority to support the local, regional, national, and international airports in Virginia by providing the means for attracting new passenger air service routes by advertising and promoting new air service routes that would commence in Virginia. The bill provides that expenditures must be consistent with the commercial air service plan adopted by the Virginia Aviation Board. The bill requires that a grant from the Fund shall not be awarded if it can be reasonably anticipated to result in the reduction of existing commercial air service at another airport located within the Commonwealth.
Title
Governor's New Airline Service Incentive Fund; created.
Sponsors
Del. Terry Austin [R] | Del. Matt Fariss [R] | Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Joseph McNamara [R] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (88-Y 10-N) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 8-N) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 8-N) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1119) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1119 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1602ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (88-Y 10-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (88-Y 10-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Conference substitute printed 20109754D-H2 |
2020-03-05 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senators: Edwards, Newman, Ebbin |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-02-28 | House | Delegates: Austin, Bulova, Plum |
2020-02-28 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-02-28 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 20108381D-S1 (0-Y 99-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1602S1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108381D-S1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108381D-S1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (90-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (90-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1602H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107730D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107730D-H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104632D |
Same As/Similar To
SB990 (Same As) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1120)