VA HB1613 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0150)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0150)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Penalty for wanton waste. Changes from a Class 3 misdemeanor to a Class 2 misdemeanor the penalty for violating a regulation prohibiting wanton waste, or the allowing of a killed or crippled game animal or nonmigratory game bird to be wasted without making a reasonable effort to retrieve the animal.
Title
Wanton waste; penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0150) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 150 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1613ER) |
2019-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-23 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-08-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-08-21 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100057D |