VA HB1614 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Victims of human trafficking; affirmative defense to prosecution for certain offenses. Provides an affirmative defense to prosecution for prostitution and keeping, residing in, or frequenting a bawdy place if, at the time of the offense leading to such charge, such person was a victim of human trafficking, as defined in the bill, and (i) was coerced to engage in the offense through the use of force or intimidation of another, (ii) such offense was committed as part of a commercial sex trafficking scheme, or (iii) such offense was committed at the direction of an operator of a commercial sex trafficking scheme. The bill also states that a victim of human trafficking may raise such affirmative defense regardless of whether any other person has been arrested for, prosecuted for, charged with, or convicted of an offense.
Title
Victims of human trafficking; affirmative defense to prosecution for certain offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Left in Judiciary |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Recommitted to Judiciary |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1614H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107515D-H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107515D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104514D |