VA HB1615 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-15 - Defeated by Senate (11-Y 28-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-15 - Defeated by Senate (11-Y 28-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; date of June primary election. Changes the date of the primary election held in June from the second Tuesday in June to the third Tuesday in June. The bill also changes candidate filing deadlines to reflect the change of date.
Title
Elections; date of June primary election.
Sponsors
Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Steve Heretick [D] | Del. Christopher Peace [R] |
Del. Brenda Pogge [R] | Del. Robert Thomas [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (11-Y 28-N) (Y: 11 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (7-Y 5-N) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 8-N) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (7-Y 5-N) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 8-N) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (11-Y 28-N) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (7-Y 5-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 8-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (91-Y 8-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-12 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-08-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-08-28 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100239D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 515 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 515.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |