VA HB1619 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Children's Services Act; special education programs. Expands eligibility for services under the Children's Services Act to students who transfer from an approved private school special education program to a public school special education program established and funded jointly by a local governing body and school division located within Planning District 16 for the purpose of providing special education and related services when (i) the public school special education program is able to provide services comparable to those of an approved private school special education program and (ii) the student would require placement in an approved private school special education program but for the availability of the public school special education program.
Title
Children's Services Act; special education programs.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Thomas [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-09-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-09-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100306D |