VA HB1619 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1619
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; subtraction for low-income military veterans with a permanent service-connected disability. Provides an income tax subtraction for the military retirement income received by a veteran who has been rated with a 100 percent service-connected, permanent, and total disability. The bill provides that the subtraction is available only to those taxpayers whose federal adjusted gross income is not greater than 150 percent of the federal poverty level for a four-person household.
Title
Income tax, state; subtraction for low-income military veterans with a service-connected disability.
Sponsors
Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. Alex Askew [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Jason Miyares [R] |
Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1619H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106819D-H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations (17-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106819D-H1 |
2020-01-29 | House | Incorporates HB125 (Miyares) |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105965D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1619 (Carry Over) 2020-02-19 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
HB125 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Finance
HB125 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Finance