VA HB1621 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1621
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Urban Agriculture Advisory Council created; report. Creates the Virginia Urban Agriculture Advisory Council as an advisory council in the legislative branch of state government to encourage urban agriculture and contribute to building a local food economy. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2023.
Title
Virginia Urban Agriculture Advisory Council; created, report.
Sponsors
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105263D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1621 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N)