VA HB1624 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Sanctions; other frivolous pleadings. Provides that a court may consider other similar, previously filed pleadings, motions, or other papers filed by a person in violation of the sanctions statute in determining sanctions on the case immediately before the court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sanctions; other frivolous pleadings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13SenatePassed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
2019-01-08HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-10-23HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-10-23HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100277D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801271.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback