VA HB1625 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0532)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Animal care; adequate shelter. Provides that the definition of "adequate shelter" includes the provision of shelter that, during hot weather, is shaded and does not readily conduct heat and, during cold weather, has a windbreak at its entrance and provides sufficient bedding material.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal care; adequate shelter, exposure to heat or cold.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (80-Y 18-N) (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 15-N) (Y: 84 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 9-N) (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0532)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 532 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1625ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION #2 (80-Y 18-N)
2019-02-21HouseConference report agreed to by House (80-Y 18-N)
2019-02-21HouseReconsideration of conference report agreed to by House
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 15-N)
2019-02-21HouseConference report agreed to by House (84-Y 15-N)
2019-02-21HouseConference substitute printed 19107564D-H1
2019-02-21 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Stuart, Spruill, Stanley
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-20HouseDelegates: Orrock, Marshall, Keam
2019-02-20HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-20HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-19SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-19SenateSenate insisted on substitute (37-Y 3-N)
2019-02-18HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N)
2019-02-18HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 19107057D-S2 (0-Y 98-N)
2019-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate with substitute (34-Y 6-N)
2019-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB1625S2
2019-02-14SenateSubstitute by Senator Spruill agreed to 19107057D-S2
2019-02-14SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-14SenateFloor substitute printed 19107057D-S2 (Spruill)
2019-02-14SenateCommittee substitute rejected 19106636D-S1
2019-02-14SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-12SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106636D-S1
2019-02-07SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 5-N)
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-22HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 9-N)
2019-01-22HouseRead third time and passed House (88-Y 9-N)
2019-01-21HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-18HouseRead first time
2019-01-16HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 1-N)
2019-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-10-23HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2018-10-23HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100436D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326500(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1625
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1625+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1625S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1625S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1625H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1625ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0532+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0101V0004+HB1625
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H01V0003+HB1625
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1768+HB1625
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S01V0079+HB1625
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0501HB1625+HB1625
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0654HB1625+HB1625
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2891+HB1625
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0781HB1625+HB1625
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3248+HB1625
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3252+HB1625
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1010HB1625+HB1625

Bill Comments

feedback