VA HB1626 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Requires 66 affirmative votes to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Requires 66 affirmative votes to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Students receiving home instruction; participation in interscholastic programs. Prohibits public schools from joining an organization governing interscholastic programs that does not deem eligible for participation a student who (i) is receiving home instruction; (ii) has demonstrated evidence of progress for two consecutive academic years; (iii) is in compliance with immunization requirements; (iv) is entitled to free tuition in a public school; (v) has not reached the age of 19 by August 1 of the current academic year; (vi) is an amateur who receives no compensation but participates solely for the educational, physical, mental, and social benefits of the activity; (vii) complies with all disciplinary rules and is subject to all codes of conduct applicable to all public high school athletes; and (viii) complies with all other rules governing awards, all-star games, maximum consecutive semesters of high school enrollment, parental consents, physical examinations, and transfers applicable to all high school athletes. The bill provides that no local school board is required to permit students receiving home instruction in interscholastic programs. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2020.
Title
Students receiving home instruction; participation in public school interscholastic programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (60-Y 39-N) (Y: 62 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (62-Y 37-N) (Y: 64 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (60-Y 40-N) (Y: 62 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 13-N) (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 41-N) (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (62-Y 37-N) (Y: 64 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (60-Y 40-N) (Y: 62 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 13-N) (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 41-N) (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Requires 66 affirmative votes to override Governor's veto |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (60-Y 39-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House sustained Governor's veto (60-Y 39-N) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1626ER) |
2015-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (62-Y 37-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (62-Y 37-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Reconsideration of Senate amendment agreed to by House |
2015-02-19 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (60-Y 40-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (60-Y 40-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 13-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Garrett agreed to |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 6-N) |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-01-29 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 41-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 41-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1626H1 |
2015-01-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104226D-H1 |
2015-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104226D-H1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2015-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101628D |